Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Révész

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hungary, Military

Titular Bishop of Trebenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1862BornVác
18 Jul 188522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vác, Hungary
3 Mar 192865.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hungary, Military
3 Mar 192865.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Trebenna
3 Jun 192865.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trebenna
18 Jan 192966.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Hungary, Military

MicroData Summary for István Révész:
Bishop István Révész (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hungary, Military

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013