Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gyözö Horváth

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1867BornCsutortok
24 Jun 189022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
26 Mar 191244.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
26 Mar 191244.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
14 Apr 191244.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
19 Dec 194477.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gyözö Horváth:
Bishop Gyözö Horváth (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013