Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Virág

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1869BornBonyhád
25 Jun 189222.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 192656.6AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
6 May 192656.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
2 Mar 195888.5DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Virág:
Bishop Ferenc Virág (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013