Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gyula Zichy

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1871BornNagyland
4 Jul 189523.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 190534.1AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
21 Dec 190534.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
31 Aug 192553.8AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
20 May 194270.5DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gyula Zichy:
Archbishop Gyula Zichy (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013