Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lipót Árpád Várady

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1865Born
26 Jul 188823.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 191145.8AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
18 Jun 191146.0Ordained BishopBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
25 May 191448.9AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
18 Feb 192357.6DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Lipót Árpád Várady
Archbishop Lipót Árpád Várady (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTemesvar [Timisoara]

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018