Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Kutrovatz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Titular Bishop of Marciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1841Born
5 May 186524.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Győr (Raab), Hungary
6 May 186524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Győr (Raab), Hungary
19 Apr 189756.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
19 Apr 189756.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
9 May 189756.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana
21 Oct 191372.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ernest Kutrovatz (VIAF: 309791334)
Bishop Ernest Kutrovatz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiklosd, Diocese of Győr (Raab)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Győr, Diocese of Győr (Raab)

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017