Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vilmos István

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1849Born
12 Aug 187425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Szombathely, Hungary
28 Nov 189849.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary
28 Nov 189849.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
15 Jan 189949.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dometiopolis
1 Nov 190152.3SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
16 Dec 190152.4ConfirmedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
25 Dec 191061.5DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Vilmos István
Bishop Vilmos István (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZala-Egerszeg, Diocese of Szombathely
Ordained BishopSzombathely, Diocese of Szombathely

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 249, and Page 490
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,899, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,457

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast