Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antal Papp

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of Miskolc (Hungarian)

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1867BornNagykallo
24 Dec 189326.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 191244.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
29 Apr 191244.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lyrbe
1 Jun 191244.5SucceededBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
14 Oct 191244.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
14 Jul 192456.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
14 Jul 192456.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
24 Dec 194578.1DiedApostolic Exarch of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Antal Papp:
Archbishop Antal Papp (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of Miskolc

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013