Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Novák

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1879BornUbla
9 Jan 190525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
20 Nov 191333.9AppointedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
11 Jan 191434.1Ordained BishopBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
1 Oct 191838.8ResignedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
5 Sep 193252.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Stefan Novák:
Bishop Stefan Novák (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prešov (Prjašev)

  • a priest for 27.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Nov 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 1
  • opd/c1: CB, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015