Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Pásztélyi Kovács

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1826Born
24 Jun 184923.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Jul 184923.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 187448.5SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
15 Mar 187548.8ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
18 Apr 187548.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
24 Mar 189164.8DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for János Pásztélyi Kovács
Bishop János Pásztélyi Kovács (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeljaty
Ordained BishopPrešov, Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • bd/bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 396
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017