Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gyula Meszlényi

Deceased

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1832Born
10 Mar 185422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jul 185422.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 188755.7SelectedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
29 Apr 188856.2Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
14 Mar 190573.1DiedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Gyula Meszlényi
Bishop Gyula Meszlényi (born , died ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencze
Ordained BishopSatu Mare, Diocese of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 532
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017