Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
4 Feb 1857 | Born | ||
1881² | 23.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
7 Aug 1916 | 59.5 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop |
12 May 1924 | 67.2 | Converted | |
2 Apr 1933 | 76.1 | Died | Bishop |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Kalnik |
Death Place | Trenton, NJ, USA |
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠