Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop MikulᚠTóth

Deceased

Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1833Born
3 Dec 185724.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
18 Dec 185724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
3 Apr 187642.6AppointedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
21 May 187642.7Ordained BishopBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
21 May 188248.7DiedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for MikulᚠTóth
Bishop MikulᚠTóth (born , died ) Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMukacevo, Eparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
Ordained BishopMukacevo, Eparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 260
  • opd/c013: CB, 5 Jun 2015
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,465
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018