Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mihail (Mychajlo) Cardinal Lewicki (Levyckyj)

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1774BornLanczyn
1798²23.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 181339.1AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ruthenian), Poland
20 Sep 181339.1Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ruthenian), Poland
17 Aug 181541.0SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
8 Mar 181641.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jun 185681.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 185883.4DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mihail (Mychajlo) Lewicki (Levyckyj):
Cardinal Mihail (Mychajlo) Lewicki (Levyckyj) (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
  • a cardinal for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • bp/bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014