Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Antoni de Potoczki

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1759³Born
9 Jul 178626.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Aug 178626.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 182565.1SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
19 Dec 182565.9ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
12 Mar 182666.2Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
16 May 183272.3DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Antoni de Potoczki (VIAF: 302232072)
Bishop Jan Antoni de Potoczki (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElisabethstadt

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 314
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast