Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Jakub Szymonowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1740Born
11 Aug 176423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
12 Sep 180059.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
1 Mar 180160.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
3 Oct 181675.7DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Jakub Szymonowicz (VIAF: 308742861)
Archbishop Jan Jakub Szymonowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamyanets-Podilskyi
Death PlaceLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian)

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,772
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 236
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018