Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikolaj Skorodynski

Deceased

Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1757Born
6 Jan 178224.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 179841.7SelectedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Mar 179942.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 May 180548.3DiedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mikolaj Skorodynski
Bishop Mikolaj Skorodynski (born , died ) Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZboriv

  • a priest for 23.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 237
  • b/c2: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 270
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1799, Number 2
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,333
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 12 Oct 2020

Quantcast