Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Porifiriusz Skarbek Ważyński

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1732Born
3 Apr 179057.6AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
26 Sep 179058.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
9 Mar 180471.5DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Porifiriusz Skarbek Ważyński
Bishop Porifiriusz Skarbek Ważyński (born , died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 304
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,911
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 12 Oct 2020

Quantcast