Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Krzysztofowicz

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia

Titular See: (Vicar Apostolic/Armenians in Russian Empire)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1761¹Born
1784²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
28 Mar 180948.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
11 Jun 181049.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
26 Feb 181655.1DiedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Krzysztofowicz
Bishop Józef Krzysztofowicz (born 1761, died ) Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Armenian), Ukraine
Death PlaceMohyliv-Podilskyi

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 17
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,520
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 86
  • op/c1: CB, 20 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018