Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hryhorij Jachimowicz

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1792BornPodborze
10 Sep 181624.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Sep 181624.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 184048.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jul 184048.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
21 Nov 184149.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
5 Sep 184856.6AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ruthenian), Poland
25 Mar 184957.1InstalledBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ruthenian), Poland
5 Sep 185967.6SelectedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 Mar 186068.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
29 Apr 186371.2DiedArchbishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Hryhorij Jachimowicz:
Archbishop Hryhorij Jachimowicz (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 469, and Page 340
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013