Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)

Archidioecesis Haidudoroghensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Péter Fülöp Kocsis, Archbishop
  • Szilárd Keresztes, Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
8 June 1912ErectedEparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)
Eparchy of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovak)
Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian) (erected)
9 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian) (Arcus (Arkos), Borosneul-Mare (Nagyborosnyo), Imper (Nagykaszon), Ciucsângiorgiu (Csikszentgyörgy), Läzäresti (Csiklazarfalva), Chelinta (Gelencze), Ilieni (Ilyefalva), Lemnia (Lemhény), Lisnäu (Lisznyo), Poian (Kézdiszentkereszt), Turia (Torja), ...) Archdiocese of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian)
9 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian) (Amat (Amacz), Sätmärel (Szatmarzsadany), Ciumesti (Csomaköz), Domänesti (Domahida), Ghenciu (Genes), Moftinul-Mic (Kismajtény), Carei (Nagykaroly), Besighea (Beszege), Sanisläu (Szaniszlo), Andrid (Endréd), Dindesti (Erdengeleg), Tiream (Mezöterem), ...) Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)
9 April 1934Territory LostDiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian) (Culciul-mare (Nagykolcs), Boghis (Csengerbagos), Oar (Ovari), Petea (Pete), Doba (Szamosdob), Vetis (Yetes), Botiz (Batizvasvari), Satu-Mare (Szatmar), Odoreu (Szatmarudvari), and Jojib (Jozsefhaza)) Diocese of Maramureş (Romanian)
3 July 1939Territory AddedEparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian) (Bodrogmezo, Bodrogszerdahely, Kisdobra, and Zemplen) Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
17 July 1980Territory AddedDiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian) (Expanded to all in Hungary of the Byzantine Rite)
20 March 2015Territory LostDiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian) Eparchy of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian) (erected)
Archdiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
20 March 2015ElevatedDiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian) Archdiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
1948195,4403,038,3426.4%165151801,0852018107ap1951
1969245,0004,539,0005.4%18991981,2379122ap1971
1980300,0001621621,85114126ap1981
1990250,00018651911,308618131ap1991
1999253,00018751921,317916140ap2000
2000253,00018161871,352716139ap2001
2001253,00017161771,429716139ap2002
2002253,00018681941,3041916143ap2003
2003248,98720282101,18511013147ap2004
2004248,98720462101,185813147ap2005
2006270,00021662221,21621011145ap2007
2009270,00022472311,16896148ap2010
2013270,00018481921,4064103125ap2014
Archdiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
2015205,00018351881,0903113126ap2016
2018110,00061611,803543ap2019
2020109,9508711981,12161154ap2021
2022149,00094941,585956ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 614
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 72, Page 985, and Page 986
  • Archdiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 107, Page 504, and Page 505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 8 Nov 2023