Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Szilárd Keresztes

Bishop Emeritus of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1932 BornNyíracsád
7 Aug 195523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
7 Jan 197542.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
7 Jan 197542.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
8 Feb 197542.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chunavia
30 Jun 198855.9AppointedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
30 Jun 198855.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
10 Nov 200775.3RetiredBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
10 Nov 200775.3RetiredApostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Szilárd Keresztes:
Bishop Szilárd Keresztes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hajdúdorog

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013