Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ábel Antal Szocska, O.S.B.M.

Bishop of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1972 Born
30 Jan 199623.3ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
20 Jul 200128.8Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 Sep 200129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
31 Oct 201543.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian), Hungary
7 Apr 201845.5AppointedBishop of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian), Hungary
10 May 201845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ábel Antal Szocska
Bishop Ábel Antal Szocska O.S.B.M. (born ) Bishop of Nyíregyháza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVinohradiu, Ukraine
Ordained BishopSzent Miklós, Cathedral, Nyiregyháza, Eparchy of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2018
  • c2+: CB, 15 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 20 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,777

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast