Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Cserháti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pécs, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1914Born
1 Dec 194026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pécs, Hungary
15 Sep 196450.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
15 Sep 196450.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Melzi
28 Oct 196450.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Melzi
10 Jan 196954.7AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
3 Nov 198975.5RetiredBishop of Pécs, Hungary
12 Apr 199479.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Cserháti
Bishop József Cserháti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pécs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLengyel

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017