Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Stojka

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1890Born
17 Dec 191626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
3 May 193241.5AppointedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
12 Jul 193241.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
31 May 194352.6DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Alexander Stojka
Bishop Alexander Stojka (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaracin

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018