Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Endré Kriston

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

Titular Bishop of Gerasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1877BornKemecse
23 Aug 189922.3Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
23 Aug 192346.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
23 Aug 192346.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gerasa
30 Sep 192346.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gerasa
3 May 196083.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Endré Kriston:
Bishop Endré Kriston (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015