Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Zoltán Lajos Meszlényi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1892Born
28 Oct 191523.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 193745.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
22 Sep 193745.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
28 Oct 193745.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
4 Mar 195159.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
31 Oct 2009Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Zoltán Lajos Meszlényi (VIAF: 163973316)
Bishop Bl. Zoltán Lajos Meszlényi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHatvan

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 7 Oct 2019

Quantcast