Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lajos Szmrecsányi

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1851Born
28 Aug 187322.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 190453.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
14 Nov 190453.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
30 Apr 190554.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
26 Mar 191260.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Eger, Hungary
26 Mar 191260.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
20 Aug 191261.3SucceededArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
28 Jan 194391.7DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Lajos Szmrecsányi (VIAF: 308719945)
Archbishop Lajos Szmrecsányi (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaróc [Sarisské Dravce], Slovakia

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 40
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast