Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozsef Pétery

Deceased

Bishop of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1890Born
29 Dec 191222.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 194252.2AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
8 Nov 194252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
15 Nov 196777.4DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Jozsef Pétery
Bishop Jozsef Pétery (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiskolc

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018