Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Dessewffy

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1834Born
7 Aug 185723.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Aug 185723.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 189055.5SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
26 Jun 189056.0ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
31 Aug 189056.2Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
5 Dec 190773.5DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Alexander Dessewffy
Bishop Alexander Dessewffy (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

EventPlace
Birth PlacePocsoný, Slovakia
Ordained BishopKošice, Diocese of Košice, Slovakia

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017