Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Cselka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Carrhae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1834Born
26 Jul 185723.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jul 185723.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 189358.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
19 Jan 189358.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
11 May 189358.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
7 Mar 189762.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Cselka
Bishop Ferdinand Cselka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVámos-Mikola, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopBudapest

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017