Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janos Jung

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Rosalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1841Born
10 Aug 186524.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Aug 186524.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 189351.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
19 Jan 189351.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
11 May 189351.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
27 Feb 191775.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Janos Jung
Bishop Janos Jung (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVác, Diocese of Vác
Ordained BishopBudapest

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 484
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017