Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Ivánkovits

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rožňava, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Sidyma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1846Born
4 May 187023.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 May 187023.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 189649.9SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
3 Dec 189649.9ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
25 Apr 189750.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
5 Oct 190457.7ResignedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
11 Dec 190558.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
31 Mar 191063.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Ivánkovits
Bishop Ján Ivánkovits (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzeged, Diocese of Csanád, Hungary
Ordained BishopKalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa, Hungary

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017