Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Szele (Gzele)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Areopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1824Born
28 Jul 184622.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eger, Hungary
25 Apr 184723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Eger, Hungary
1 Jun 188864.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary
1 Jun 188864.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
9 Sep 188864.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
1903¹78.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Szele (Gzele)
Bishop Gabriel Szele (Gzele) (born , died 1903) Auxiliary Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJászberény, Archdiocese of Eger
Ordained BishopEger, Archdiocese of Eger

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017