Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nándor Dulánszky

Deceased

Bishop of Pécs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1829BornEsztergom
6 Aug 185323.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
7 Aug 185323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
11 Jun 187545.7SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
17 Sep 187545.9ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
8 Dec 187546.1Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
1 Jun 187747.6SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Jun 187747.7ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
24 Jan 189666.3DiedBishop of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Nándor Dulánszky:
Bishop Nándor Dulánszky (born , died ) Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 85, and Page 474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013