Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Andrássy

Deceased

Bishop of Rožňava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1742Born
29 Aug 177229.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 178037.6SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
18 Sep 178037.8ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
23 Dec 178038.1Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
12 Nov 1799³57.0DiedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Andrássy
Bishop Anton Andrássy (born , died ) Bishop of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRomanfalva

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 359
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018