Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Kollárcsik

Deceased

Bishop of Rožňava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1796Born
26 Aug 181923.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Aug 181923.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 185053.6SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
30 Sep 185054.1ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
23 Feb 185154.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
18 Jul 186972.9DiedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for István Kollárcsik
Bishop István Kollárcsik (born , died ) Bishop of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZsebfalu
Ordained BishopNitra, Diocese of Nitra

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1869
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017