Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Maria Davídek

Deceased

Bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1921BornChrice, Czech Republic
29 Jul 194524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brno, Czech Republic
29 Oct 196746.8Ordained BishopBishop
16 Aug 198867.6DiedBishop

MicroData Summary for Felix Maria Davídek:
Bishop Felix Maria Davídek (born , died ) Bishop of (unknown)

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,931
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,375
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,511

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013