Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bottino

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1894BornChialamberto
29 Jun 192026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
13 Dec 194753.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
13 Dec 194753.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
7 Mar 194854.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Palaestina
20 Mar 197379.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bottino:
Bishop Francesco Bottino (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 May 2014