Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Livio Maritano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1925BornGiaveno
27 Jun 194822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
19 Oct 196843.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
19 Oct 196843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Opitergium
15 Dec 196843.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Opitergium
30 Jun 197953.8AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
9 Dec 200075.3RetiredBishop of Acqui, Italy
6 May 201488.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Livio Maritano:
Bishop Livio Maritano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acqui

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 45.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 6 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 May 2014