Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Piero Pioppo

Apostolic Nuncio to Indonesia

Titular Archbishop of Torcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1960 Born
29 Jun 198524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
25 Jan 201049.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Torcello
25 Jan 201049.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cameroun
25 Jan 201049.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Equatorial Guinea
18 Mar 201049.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Torcello
8 Sep 201756.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Piero Pioppo
Archbishop Piero Pioppo (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Indonesia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona, Diocese of Savona e Noli, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Indonesia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,586
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Sep 2017