Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nsue Edjang Mayé

Bishop of Ebebiyin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1957 BornMikomeseng-Kie Ntem
25 Mar 199537.4Ordained PriestPriest of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea
19 Feb 201153.3AppointedBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
7 May 201153.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Juan Nsue Edjang Mayé:
Bishop Juan Nsue Edjang Mayé (born ) Bishop of Ebebiyin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ebebiyin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2011
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,052

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013