Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bata

Dioecesis Bataensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Juan Matogo Oyana, C.M.F., Bishop
  • Anacleto Sima Ngua, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 May 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Malabo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Equatorial Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 6,681 (2,580 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apdo 82, Bata, Litoral, Guinea Ecuatorial
  • Telephone: 222.27.2496

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Río Muni
9 August 1965ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Fernando Poo Vicariate Apostolic of Río Muni (erected)
Diocese of Bata
3 May 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Río Muni Diocese of Bata
15 October 1982Territory LostDiocese of Bata Diocese of Ebebiyin (erected)
1 April 2017Territory LostDiocese of Bata Diocese of Evinayong (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bata
1970170,000185,00091.9%1318315,4831841ap1971
1980170,700185,00092.3%1015256,828289515ap1981
1990125,000131,24195.2%1917363,4721355915ap1991
1996140,282140,54799.8%2723502,8051389114ap2001
2001136,642136,82299.9%2423472,9071416426ap2002
2002136,642136,82299.9%3823612,2402566430ap2004
2004136,642136,82299.9%3724612,2402628927ap2005
2006141,000142,00099.3%4124652,1692618626ap2007
2012116,500167,00069.8%4726731,5951495928ap2013
2015126,200181,50069.5%5326791,597617531ap2016
201776,200109,91069.3%3818561,360614418bul:1Apr2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_d, v3.1.9, 15 Apr 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017