Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anacleto Sima Ngua

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bata, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1936Born
24 Jun 196327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bata, Equatorial Guinea
19 Nov 198246.4AppointedBishop of Bata, Equatorial Guinea
6 Jan 198346.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bata, Equatorial Guinea
11 May 200265.9ResignedBishop of Bata, Equatorial Guinea
1 Jul 201882.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Bata, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Anacleto Sima Ngua
Bishop Anacleto Sima Ngua (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMitemleté
Death PlaceMalabo

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jul 2018

Quantcast