Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan Domingo-Beka Esono Ayang, C.M.F.

Bishop-Elect of Mongomo, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1969 Born
2 Sep 200233.5ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
28 Sep 200334.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
1 Apr 201748.1AppointedBishop of Mongomo, Equatorial Guinea
20 May 201748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mongomo, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Juan Domingo-Beka Esono Ayang
Father Juan Domingo-Beka Esono Ayang C.M.F. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Mongomo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMabewele-Yenkéng, Diocese of Bata

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mongomo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017