Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Matogo Oyana, C.M.F.

Bishop of Bata, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1949 Born
19 Dec 197627.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
11 Oct 199142.3AppointedBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
6 Jan 199242.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ebebiyin, Equatorial Guinea
11 May 200252.9AppointedBishop of Bata, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Juan Matogo Oyana
Bishop Juan Matogo Oyana C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of Bata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNkué-Esandon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,555
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017