Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Alain Mbarga

Bishop of Ebolowa, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1968 Born
10 Dec 199426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mbalmayo, Cameroon
22 Oct 201648.7AppointedBishop of Ebolowa, Cameroon
8 Dec 201648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ebolowa, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Philippe Alain Mbarga
Bishop Philippe Alain Mbarga (born ) Bishop of Ebolowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObout, Diocese of Mbalmayo
Ordained BishopStade municipal Nko`ovos, Ebolowa, Diocese of Ebolowa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ebolowa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2016
  • c1: CB, 24 Oct 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,221

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast