Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludwig Schick

Archbishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1949 Born
15 Jun 197525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
20 May 199848.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
20 May 199848.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
12 Jul 199848.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
28 Jun 200252.7AppointedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Schick (VIAF: 18150968)
Archbishop Ludwig Schick (born ) Archbishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarburg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bamberg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,354
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Jan 2017