Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Gueye

Bishop of Thiès, Senegal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1967 Born
14 Dec 199124.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Thiès, Senegal
27 Jun 199225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Thiès, Senegal
18 Jan 201346.0AppointedBishop of Thiès, Senegal
25 May 201346.3Ordained BishopBishop of Thiès, Senegal

MicroData Summary for André Gueye
Bishop André Gueye (born ) Bishop of Thiès

EventPlace
Birth PlacePallo-Youga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Thiès.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 24 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,792

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018