Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kaolack

Dioecesis Kaolackensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 6 July 1965
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Dakar
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Senegal
  • Square Kilometers: 21,299 (8,226 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 58, route de Fatick, Kaolack, Senegal
  • Telephone: 33.941.13.74
  • Fax: 33.941.52.94

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaolack
21 January 1957ErectedArchdiocese of Dakar
Diocese of Ziguinchor
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaolack (erected)
Diocese of Kaolack
6 July 1965ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaolack Diocese of Kaolack
13 August 1970Territory LostDiocese of Kaolack
Diocese of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
Prefecture Apostolic of Tambacounda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Kaolack
19706,600736,000.9%202033027481ap1971
19806,607863,500.8%242427537441ap1981
19908,6321,210,119.7%61622392315914ap1991
199911,2381,495,083.8%11142544930571ap2000
200011,9061,563,640.8%12132547631631ap2001
200112,2011,621,042.8%15142942026681ap2002
200212,6891,669,673.8%17133042229701ap2003
200314,1751,705,915.8%161430472296715ap2004
200414,4501,741,000.8%151934425446915ap2005
200614,7551,689,565.9%151833447366815ap2007
201118,4251,930,0001.0%271643428396217ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.4, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 22 Dec 2014